ND HB1033 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 19-02.1-14.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prescribing of biosimilar drugs.
Title
Prescribing of biosimilar drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Governor 04/19 |
2021-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 |
2021-04-13 | House | Concurred |
2021-03-23 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1 |
2021-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2021-01-06 | House | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |