ND HB1032 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-06.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a sliding fee schedule for the service payments for elderly and disabled program.
Title
A sliding fee schedule for the service payments for elderly and disabled program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by Governor 03/28 |
2019-03-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-25 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 6 0 0 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 19 0 2 |
2019-01-30 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment adopted |
2019-01-29 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-01-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |