ND HB1028 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by Governor 03/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by Governor 03/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 26.1-36.6 and a new section to chapter 54-52.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public employees retirement system self-insurance plans for health benefits coverage; to amend and reenact sections 26.1-07.1-01, 54-52.1-01, 54-52.1-04, 54-52.1-04.2, 54-52.1-04.3, 54-52.1-05, and 54-52.1-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public employee uniform group health benefits coverage; to repeal sections 54-52.1-04.4, 54-52.1-04.5, 54-52.1-04.6, 54-52.1-04.10, 54-52.1-04.11, 54-52.1-04.12, 54-52.1-04.13, and 54-52.1-04.14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public employees retirement system self-insurance plans for health benefits coverage mandated health benefits; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Public employees retirement system self-insurance plans for health benefits coverage mandated health benefits; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Governor 03/06 |
2019-03-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-28 | House | Returned to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 37 nays 8, Emergency clause carried |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-01-14 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |