ND HB1021 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of workforce safety and insurance; and to provide for a report.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of workforce safety and insurance; and to provide for a report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by Governor 04/28 |
2021-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 2 |
2021-04-23 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-21 | House | New conference committee appointed Nathe Schatz Boe |
2021-04-20 | House | Conference committee report rejected |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported back from conference committee, further amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Hogue Oehlke Heckaman |
2021-04-12 | House | Conference committee appointed Nathe Schatz Boe |
2021-04-12 | House | Refused to concur |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 7 |
2021-02-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 0 1 |
2021-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |