ND HB1007 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of labor and human rights; to amend and reenact sections 14-02.4-15 and 34-14-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to discriminatory practices in public services and employee claims for wages; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
Discriminatory practices in public services and employee claims for wages; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Signed by Governor 04/24 |
2017-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 11 |
2017-04-19 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Hogue Sorvaag Mathern |
2017-04-07 | House | Conference committee appointed Boehning Brabandt Delmore |
2017-04-07 | House | Refused to concur |
2017-04-03 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 5 |
2017-02-16 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 1 4 |
2017-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2017-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-04 | House | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |