ND HB1003 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the attorney general; to provide an appropriation to the department of human services; to amend and reenact the new section to chapter 53-06.1, as created by section 1 of House Bill No. 1212, as approved by the sixty-seventh legislative assembly, and section 54-12-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salary of the attorney general and charitable gaming tax revenue distributions; to provide for a transfer; to provide an exemption; to provide for a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a report; to provide for a legislative management study; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The salary of the attorney general and charitable gaming tax revenue distributions; to provide for a transfer; to provide an exemption; to provide for a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a report; to provide for a legislative management study; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by Governor 04/28 |
2021-04-27 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 3 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 5, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-23 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Bekkedahl Holmberg Mathern |
2021-04-12 | House | Conference committee appointed Kempenich Howe Mock |
2021-04-12 | House | Refused to concur |
2021-04-07 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 10 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 0 2 |
2021-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |