NC S786 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-04 - Ch. SL 2014-4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-04 - Ch. SL 2014-4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Energy Modernization Act
Title
Energy Modernization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Rucho [R] | Sen. Eldon Newton [R] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] | Sen. David Curtis [R] |
Sen. James Davis [R] | Sen. Richard Gunn [R] | Sen. William Jackson [R] | Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] |
Sen. Trudy Wade [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - A20 Hager Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - A19 Reives M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - A18 Cunningham Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-05-29 - House - A17 Jackson M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 53 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - A16 Queen Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-05-29 - House - A15 Martin, G. Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-05-29 - House - A13 Fisher Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 67 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-05-29 - House - A12 Harrison M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - A11 Hager Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - A10 Hager Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - A9 Hager Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - A8 Luebke Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-05-29 - House - A7 Glazier Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-05-29 - House - A6 Collins M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - A5 Carney M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 51 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 63 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - A4 Meyer Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-05-28 - House - A3 Stam Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - A2 Stam Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - A1 Stam Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - Motion 12 - Add to Calendar (Y: 66 N: 50 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Amendment 8 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Amendment 7 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-05-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - A20 Hager Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - A19 Reives M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - A18 Cunningham Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-05-29 - House - A17 Jackson M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 53 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - A16 Queen Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-05-29 - House - A15 Martin, G. Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-05-29 - House - A13 Fisher Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 67 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-05-29 - House - A12 Harrison M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - A11 Hager Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - A10 Hager Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - A9 Hager Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - A8 Luebke Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-05-29 - House - A7 Glazier Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-05-29 - House - A6 Collins M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - A5 Carney M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 51 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 63 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - A4 Meyer Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-05-28 - House - A3 Stam Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - A2 Stam Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - A1 Stam Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - Motion 12 - Add to Calendar (Y: 66 N: 50 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Amendment 8 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Amendment 7 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | Ch. SL 2014-4 | |
2014-06-04 | Signed by Gov. 6/4/2014 | |
2014-05-30 | Pres. To Gov. 05/30/2014 | |
2014-05-29 | Ratified | |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2014-05-29 | House | Special Message sent to the Senate |
2014-05-29 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2014-05-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-05-29 | House | Amend Adopted A20 |
2014-05-29 | House | Amend Tabled A19 |
2014-05-29 | House | Amend Failed A18 |
2014-05-29 | House | Amend Tabled A17 |
2014-05-29 | House | Amend Failed A16 |
2014-05-29 | House | Amend Failed A15 |
2014-05-29 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A14 |
2014-05-29 | House | Amend Failed A13 |
2014-05-29 | House | Amend Tabled A12 |
2014-05-29 | House | Amend Adopted A11 |
2014-05-29 | House | Amend Adopted A10 |
2014-05-29 | House | Amend Adopted A9 |
2014-05-29 | House | Amend Failed A8 |
2014-05-29 | House | Amend Failed A7 |
2014-05-29 | House | Amend Tabled A6 |
2014-05-29 | House | Amend Tabled A5 |
2014-05-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-05-28 | House | Amend Failed A4 |
2014-05-28 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2014-05-28 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2014-05-28 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-05-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-05-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-05-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-05-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2014-05-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-27 | House | Ref to the Com on Public Utilities and Energy, if favorable, Finance |
2014-05-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-27 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2014-05-22 | Engrossed | |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Amend Adopted A8 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Amend Adopted A7 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Amend Adopted A6 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Amend Adopted A5 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Amend Failed A4 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Amend Failed A3 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Amend Failed A2 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Amend Failed A1 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Filed |