NC H765 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-22 - Ch. SL 2015-286
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Regulatory Reform Act of 2015

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulatory Reform Act of 2015

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 73 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Amendment 15 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Amendment 14 (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 13 (Y: 14 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 12 (Y: 15 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 11 (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 10 (Y: 14 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 9 (Y: 15 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 8 (Y: 15 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 7 (Y: 14 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-22 Ch. SL 2015-286
2015-10-22 Signed by Gov. 10/22/2015
2015-10-01 Pres. To Gov. 10/1/2015
2015-09-30 Ratified
2015-09-29HouseOrdered Enrolled
2015-09-29HouseConf Report #2 Adopted
2015-09-28HousePlaced On Cal For 09/29/2015
2015-09-28HouseConf Com Reported
2015-09-28SenateConf Report Adopted
2015-09-28SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2015-09-28SenateConf Com Reported
2015-09-28SenateConf Rept Withdrawn
2015-09-28HouseConf Rpt Withdrawn
2015-09-24SenatePlaced On Cal For 09/28/2015
2015-09-24HousePlaced On Cal For 09/28/2015
2015-09-24SenateConf Com Reported
2015-09-24HouseConf Com Reported
2015-07-27SenateConf Com Appointed
2015-07-22HouseConf Com Appointed
2015-07-22HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2015-07-21HousePlaced On Cal For 07/22/2015
2015-07-21HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2015-07-21HouseReptd Unfav For Conc
2015-07-14HouseRe-ref Com On Environment
2015-07-14HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2015-07-14HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2015-07-13HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2015-07-13SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2015-07-02 Engrossed
2015-07-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2015-07-02SenateAmend Adopted A15
2015-07-02SenateAmend Adopted A14
2015-07-01SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2015-07-01SenateAmend Failed A13
2015-07-01SenateAmend Failed A12
2015-07-01SenateAmend Adopted A11
2015-07-01SenateAmend Failed A10
2015-07-01SenateAmend Failed A9
2015-07-01SenateAmend Failed A8
2015-07-01SenateAmend Failed A7
2015-07-01SenateAmend Adopted A6
2015-07-01SenateAmend Adopted A5
2015-07-01SenateAmend Adopted A4
2015-07-01SenateAmend Adopted A3
2015-07-01SenateAmend Adopted A2
2015-07-01SenateAmend Adopted A1
2015-06-30SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2015-06-30SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2015-06-29SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2015-06-29SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2015-06-29SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2015-06-29SenateSequential Referral To Finance Added
2015-06-01SenateRe-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
2015-06-01SenateWithdrawn From Com
2015-04-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2015-04-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2015-04-27SenateRegular Message Received From House
2015-04-23HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2015-04-23HousePassed 3rd Reading
2015-04-23HousePassed 2nd Reading
2015-04-23HouseAdded to Calendar
2015-04-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2015-04-23HouseReptd Fav
2015-04-15HouseRef To Com On Environment
2015-04-15HousePassed 1st Reading
2015-04-14HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2015&BillID=H765&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H765v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H765v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H765v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H765v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H765v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H765v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H765v6.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=343
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=488
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=489
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=490
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=491
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=492
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=493
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=494
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=495
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=496
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=497
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=498
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=499
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=500
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=501
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=504
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=505
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=506
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=870
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=737
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=1098

Bill Comments

feedback