NC H366 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Ch. SL 2014-103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

NC Farm Act of 2014

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NC Farm Act of 2014

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-01 - House - R3 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 88 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 92 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-29 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 9 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-06 Ch. SL 2014-103
2014-08-06 Signed by Gov. 8/6/2014
2014-08-02 Pres. To Gov. 8/2/2014
2014-08-02 Ratified
2014-08-01HouseOrdered Enrolled
2014-08-01HouseConf Report Adopted 3rd
2014-07-31HouseConf Report Adopted 2nd
2014-07-30SenateConf Report Adopted 3rd
2014-07-30HousePlaced On Cal For 07/31/2014
2014-07-30HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2014-07-30HouseRuled Material
2014-07-30HouseReptd Fav For Adoption
2014-07-29HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2014-07-29HouseReptd Fav For Adoption
2014-07-29SenateConf Report Adopted 2nd
2014-07-28SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/29/2014
2014-07-28SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2014-07-24HouseRe-ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Finance
2014-07-24HouseConf Com Reported
2014-07-24SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/28/2014
2014-07-24SenateConf Com Reported
2014-07-14SenateConf Com Appointed
2014-07-03HouseFail To Concur - Appoint Conferees Message Sent To Senate
2014-07-03HouseConf Com Appointed
2014-07-03HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2014-07-03HouseAdded to Calendar
2014-07-03HouseWithdrawn From Com
2014-06-30HouseRef To Com On Agriculture
2014-06-30HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2014-06-26SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2014-06-26 Engrossed
2014-06-26SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2014-06-26SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2014-06-26SenateAmend Failed A2
2014-06-26SenateAmend Adopted A1
2014-06-25SenateReptd Fav
2014-06-24SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2014-06-24SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2014-06-24SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2014-06-23SenateRe-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
2014-06-23SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2014-06-23SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2014-06-17SenateSequential Referral To Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Added
2014-06-17SenateRe-ref Com On Judiciary II
2014-06-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2013-04-08SenateRef To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
2013-04-08SenatePassed 1st Reading
2013-04-08SenateRec From House
2013-04-04HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-04-04HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-04-03HousePlaced On Cal For 04/04/2013
2013-04-03HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2013-04-03HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2013-03-21HouseRef To Com On Agriculture
2013-03-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2013-03-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S387 (Same As) 2013-06-19 - Ch. SL 2013-155

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2013&BillID=H366&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H366v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H366v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H366v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H366v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H366v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H366v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H366v6.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H366v7.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=210
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=1103
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=1104
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=1105
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=1770
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=1210
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=1218
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=1822
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=1838

Bill Comments

feedback