NC H243 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-29)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Ch. SL 2017-74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Strengthen Opioid Misuse Prevention (STOP)Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Strengthen Opioid Misuse Prevention (STOP)Act

Sponsors

Rep. Gregory Murphy [R]Rep. Robert Davis [R]Rep. Christopher Malone [R]Rep. Dwight Horn [R]
Rep. Allen McNeill [R]Rep. Amos Quick [D]Rep. Andy Dulin [R]Rep. Becky Carney [D]
Rep. Bert Jones [R]Rep. Beverly Boswell [R]Rep. Bobbie Richardson [D]Rep. Brenden Jones [R]
Rep. Brian Turner [D]Rep. Carl Ford [R]Rep. Cecil Brockman [D]Rep. Charles Graham [D]
Rep. Charles McGrady [R]Rep. Cody Henson [R]Rep. Cynthia Ball [D]Rep. Darren Jackson [D]
Rep. Deb Butler [D]Rep. Dennis Riddell [R]Rep. Donna White [R]Rep. Donny Lambeth [R]
Rep. Edward Hanes [D]Rep. Elmer Floyd [D]Rep. Evelyn Terry [D]Rep. Francis Iler [R]
Rep. George Cleveland [R]Rep. George Graham [D]Rep. Graig Meyer [D]Rep. Harry Warren [R]
Rep. Holly Grange [R]Rep. Hugh Blackwell [R]Rep. James Adams [R]Rep. James Boles [R]
Rep. James Dixon [R]Rep. Jean Farmer-Butterfield [D]Rep. John Ager [D]Rep. John Bradford [R]
Rep. John Fraley [R]Rep. Jonathan Hardister [R]Rep. Nelson Dollar [R]Rep. John Faircloth [R]
Rep. Joseph John [D]Rep. Joshua Dobson [R]Rep. Julia Howard [R]Rep. Kenneth Goodman [D]
Rep. Harold Corbin [R]Rep. Kyle Hall [R]Rep. Larry Potts [R]Rep. Larry Strickland [R]
Rep. Linda Hunt Williams [R]Rep. Marvin Lucas [D]Rep. Mary Belk [D]Rep. Michael Wray [D]
Rep. Michele Presnell [R]Rep. James Clampitt [R]Rep. Mitchell Setzer [R]Rep. Patricia McElraft [R]
Rep. Patricia Hurley [R]Rep. Phillip Shepard [R]Rep. Mary Harrison [D]Rep. Robert Reives [D]
Rep. Robert Steinburg [R]Rep. Rosa Gill [D]Rep. Sarah Stevens [R]Rep. Scott Stone [R]
Rep. Shelly Willingham [D]Rep. Stephen Ross [R]Rep. Susan Fisher [D]Rep. Susan Martin [R]
Rep. Verla Insko [D]Rep. William Brisson [D]Rep. Yvonne Holley [D]

Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - A3 Adcock Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 74 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - House - A2 Adcock Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - A1 Murphy Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseCh. SL 2017-74
2017-06-29HouseSigned by Gov. 6/29/2017
2017-06-28HousePres. To Gov. 6/28/2017
2017-06-28HouseRatified
2017-06-27HouseOrdered Enrolled
2017-06-27HouseConcurred In S/Com Sub
2017-06-26HousePlaced On Cal For 06/27/2017
2017-06-26HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-06-26HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-06-26HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2017-06-22HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2017-06-22SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2017-06-21SenateEngrossed
2017-06-21SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-21SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-21SenateAmend Adopted A1
2017-06-20SenateReptd Fav
2017-06-15SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-15SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2017-06-15SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-06-01SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-01SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-11SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-11SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-11SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-04-11HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-04-10HouseOrdered Engrossed
2017-04-10HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-10HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-10HouseAmend Failed A3
2017-04-10HouseAmend Adopted A2
2017-04-10HouseAmend Adopted A1
2017-04-06HousePlaced On Cal For 04/10/2017
2017-04-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-06HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-03-30HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations
2017-03-30HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-03-06HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Appropriations
2017-03-06HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S175 (Same As) 2017-03-07 - Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H243&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H243v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H243v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H243v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H243v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H243v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H243v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H243v6.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H243v7.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=204
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=205
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=206
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=207
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=293
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=294
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=729

Bill Comments

feedback