NC H20 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-12 - Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-12 - Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Cash Commitment Act
Title
Cash Commitment Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2023-05-03 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-05-03 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-05-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-05-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-02-28 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2023-02-28 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary 1 Stricken |
2023-02-28 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2023-01-30 | House | Ref to the Com on Banking, if favorable, Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-01-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Attorney General
Commerce
Commerce Dept.
Council Of State
Currency & Coins
Justice Dept.
Public
Public Officials
Retailing
Administrative Rules
Attorney General
Commerce
Commerce Dept.
Council Of State
Currency & Coins
Justice Dept.
Public
Public Officials
Retailing
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
66 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
66 | 501 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | 502 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | 503 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | 504 | (n/a) | Citation Text |