MS HB776 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 67-1-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Municipalities That Have Voted In Favor Of Coming Out From Under The Dry Law May Enforce Such Proper Rules And Regulations For Fixing Zones And Territories To Promote Public Health, Morals, And Safety, As They May By Ordinance Provide; To Provide That The Board Of Supervisors Of Any County That Has Voted In Favor Of Coming Out From Under The Dry Law May Make Similar Rules And Regulations As To Territory Outside Of Municipalities; To Provide That Municipalities May Enforce Such Proper Location Of Package Retailer Stores Within The Municipality By Application Of A Properly Adopted Zoning Ordinance; To Amend Section 67-1-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Alcoholic Beverage Control Division Of The Department Of Revenue Shall Not Issue Any Permit Which Would Conflict With Any Zoning Ordinance Legally Adopted By The Governing Authorities Of Any Municipality Or Rule Or Regulation Of Any Board Of Supervisors Of Any County As Set Forth In Section 67-1-7; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Local Option Alcoholic Beverage Control Law; revise certain provisions regarding authority of municipalities and counties under.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-05-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Conferees Named Harkins,Johnson,England |
2024-04-11 | House | Conferees Named Lamar,Zuber,Powell |
2024-04-10 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Amended |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2024-03-01 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed |
2024-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-01-30 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
67 | 1 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 1 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |