MO SB890 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Missing and Murdered African American Women Task Force"
Title
Creates the "Missing and Murdered African American Women Task Force"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading |
2024-05-16 | House | Bill Placed on H Informal Calendar SBs for Third Reading |
2024-05-16 | House | HA 1 H offered (Hausman)--(2837S02.06H) |
2024-05-13 | House | Bill Placed on H Informal Calendar SBs for Third Reading |
2024-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2024-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2024-05-08 | House | Re-Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2024-05-07 | House | Referred H Rules - Regulatory Oversight |
2024-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H General Laws |
2024-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H General Laws |
2024-05-06 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws |
2024-05-01 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2024-05-01 | House | H Second Read |
2024-04-30 | House | H First Read |
2024-04-29 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Perfected |
2024-04-24 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2024-04-24 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (Mosley)--(2837S02.01S) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & defeated (Moon)--(2837S02.02S) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | SS S offered (Mosley)--(2837S.02F) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reported from S Progress and Development Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Progress and Development Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Progress and Development Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Re-referred S Progress and Development Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |