MO SB298 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 298-White, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 298-White, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to payments for health care services
Title
Enacts provisions relating to payments for health care services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 298-White, with SCS |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Health and Pensions Committee w/SCS |
2019-03-06 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (1410S.04C) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | S First Read--SB 298-White |