MO SB1067 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-21 - SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 1067, 1308 & 1303) Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (3836S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-21 - SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 1067, 1308 & 1303) Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (3836S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Designates "Police Chief Mason Griffith Memorial Highway" in Gasconade County
Title
Designates "Police Chief Mason Griffith Memorial Highway" in Gasconade County
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 1067, 1308 & 1303) Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (3836S.03C) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |