MO HCB9 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to criminal proceedings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to criminal proceedings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-19HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-04-19HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-04-19HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-04-03HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-04-03HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-03-30HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)
2017-03-30HouseReported for Introduction (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2017-03-30HouseVoted to Introduce (H)
2017-03-30HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-03-28HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-03-16HouseAuthorized - Delivered to Committee on Judiciary

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback