MO HB85 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Adds public utility vehicles to the list of vehicles covered under the "Move Over Law"

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds public utility vehicles to the list of vehicles covered under the "Move Over Law"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-20 - House - House: HB 85 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2017-03-30SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2017-03-30SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2017-03-16SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-02-23SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S)
2017-02-20HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-02-20HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 1
2017-02-20HouseTaken Up
2017-02-15HousePerfected (H)
2017-02-15HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2017-02-15HouseTaken Up
2017-02-09HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-01HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2017-02-01HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-01HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-01HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-25HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-10HouseReferred: Transportation(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2016-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback