MO HB795 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Blair's Law, which adds the discharging of a firearm within or into the limits of a municipality with criminal negligence to the offense of unlawful use of a weapon
Title
Establishes Blair's Law, which adds the discharging of a firearm within or into the limits of a municipality with criminal negligence to the offense of unlawful use of a weapon
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-08 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2021-01-13 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |