MO HB310 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Second Amendment Preservation Act," which creates additional protections to the right to bear arms
Title
Establishes the "Second Amendment Preservation Act," which creates additional protections to the right to bear arms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-01-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |