MO HB2350 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the law regarding certain criminal offenses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the law regarding certain criminal offenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-03-15HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-13HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-06HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-02-28HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2018-02-01HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-31HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback