MO HB1849 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits school districts from collecting biometric information on students without the express written consent of parents or legal guardians

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits school districts from collecting biometric information on students without the express written consent of parents or legal guardians

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-11HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2016-01-28HouseReferred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
2016-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2016-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2015-12-15HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback