MO HB1450 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to criminal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to criminal law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-12 - House - House: HB 1450 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 104 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - House - House: HB 1450 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 101 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - House - House: HB 1450 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 99 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: HB 1450 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 122 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-15HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-05-15HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-05-14HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-05-14HouseHouse Distributes Conference Committee Report (H)
2020-05-14HouseSenate Message (S)
2020-05-14HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS LUETKEMEYER, ONDER, EMERY, SIFTON, MAY
2020-05-14HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-14HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES SCHROER, VEIT, GREGORY, PROUDIE, WASHINGTON
2020-05-14HouseHouse Grants Further Conference (H)
2020-05-14HouseTaken Up
2020-05-14HouseSenate Message (S)
2020-05-14HouseSenate Requests Further Conference (S)
2020-05-14HouseSenate Refuses to Adopt (C) - CCR for SS#2 SCS HB 1450, HB 1296, HCS HB 1331, and HCS HB 1898
2020-05-12HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-12HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 99 NOES: 52 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-12HouseHouse Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 101 NOES: 50 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-12HouseHouse Submits Conference Committee Report (H)
2020-05-12HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-05-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-05-11HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-05-11HouseHouse Distributes Conference Committee Report (H)
2020-05-07HouseSenate Message (S)
2020-05-06HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-06HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS LUETKEMEYER, ONDER, EMERY, SIFTON, MAY
2020-05-06HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES SCHROER, HENDERSON, PATTERSON, MITTEN, SAULS
2020-05-06HouseSenate Message (S)
2020-05-06HouseSenate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
2020-05-06HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-06HouseHouse Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
2020-05-06HouseTaken Up
2020-05-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-06HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-05-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-04-30HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-04-30SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS#2 SCS as amended
2020-04-29SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - SS#2 SCS, as amended AYES: 27 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2020-04-29SenateSS #2 Adopted - SS#2 SCS, as amended
2020-04-29SenateSS #2 Offered
2020-04-29SenateSS Withdrawn (S)
2020-04-29SenateTaken Up
2020-04-29SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2020-04-29SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2020-04-29SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2020-04-29SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2020-04-29SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2020-04-29SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2020-04-29SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-04-28SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - 1:30 pm, Wednesday, April 29, 2020, Joint Committee Room (Rm 117)
2020-04-28SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2020-04-27SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2020-04-27SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2020-04-27SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2020-04-24SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - 1:00 p.m., Monday, April 27, 2020, Senate Chamber
2020-02-20SenateSecond read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2020-01-28HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-01-27HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 122 NOES: 33 PRESENT: 3
2020-01-27HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-01-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-27HousePlaced on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
2020-01-27HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-23HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-01-22HousePerfected (H)
2020-01-22HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-01-22HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-01-15HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-15HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-15HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-14HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2020-01-14HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-14HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-13HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-09HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-02HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1450&year=2020&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3694H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3694H.01P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3694S.04C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3694S.05F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3694S.06F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3694H.07S.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3694H.09S.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/010.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay450429760-785.pdf#782
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/061.007.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/061.006.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/061.005.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback