MO HB1279 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the state and any political subdivision from conducting business with any financial institution that has a policy refusing service to firearm businesses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the state and any political subdivision from conducting business with any financial institution that has a policy refusing service to firearm businesses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23HousePublic Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
2021-03-10HouseReferred: Special Committee on Small Business(H)
2021-02-24HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-02-23HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback