MN SF998 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Cities written estimate of consultant fees request authorization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cities written estimate of consultant fees request authorization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateSecond reading
2019-04-11SenateComm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended
2019-04-08SenateJoint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
2019-04-08SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2019-03-25SenateAuthor stricken Carlson
2019-03-14SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
2019-02-27SenateAuthor added Jasinski
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Local Government
2019-02-07SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF823 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Division action, return to Government Operations

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback