MN SF990 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-07 - Author added Lourey
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-07 - Author added Lourey
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Digital student achievement backpack establishment
Title
Digital student achievement backpack establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | Senate | Author added Lourey |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1990 (Similar To) 2015-03-18 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy