MN SF975 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - House conferees Bernardy; Christensen; Keeler; Klevorn; O'Neill
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - House conferees Bernardy; Christensen; Keeler; Klevorn; O'Neill
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus higher education policy and finance bill
Title
Omnibus higher education policy and finance bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House: Passage,as amended (Y: 74 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 75 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 57 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - House - House: S.F. NO. 975 (Y: 124 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: 75 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 57 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - House - House: S.F. NO. 975 (Y: 124 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | House conferees Bernardy; Christensen; Keeler; Klevorn; O'Neill |
2021-04-21 | House | House conferees Bernardy, Christensen, Keeler, Klevorn, O'Neill |
2021-04-21 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed |
2021-04-21 | House | Senate conferees Tomassoni; Rarick; Goggin; Jasinski; Clausen |
2021-04-21 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate conferees Tomassoni; Rarick; Goggin; Jasinski; Clausen |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2021-04-19 | House | Third reading as amended |
2021-04-19 | House | Amended |
2021-04-16 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 19, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | Second reading |
2021-04-15 | House | Motion prevailed |
2021-04-15 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2021-04-15 | House | Senate file first reading |
2021-04-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF993 (Similar To) 2021-04-14 - Second reading