MN SF969 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1077
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1077
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus housing policy and finance bill
Title
Omnibus housing policy and finance bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1077 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1077 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Senate conferees Draheim; Duckworth; Dahms; Pratt; Dziedzic