MN SF946 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - Author added Newton
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - Author added Newton
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School contractor employees unemployment benefits eligibility authorization
Title
School contractor employees unemployment benefits eligibility authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. Foung Hawj [D] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Greg Clausen [D] |
Rep. Jerry Newton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | Senate | Author added Newton |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Authors added Hoffman; Clausen |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Author added Hawj |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF911 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Author added Moran.