MN SF944 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Author added Frentz
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Author added Frentz
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gasoline minimum biofuel content increase; fuel retailers blends offering requirement; dates modifications
Title
Gasoline minimum biofuel content increase; fuel retailers blends offering requirement; dates modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Senate | Author added Frentz |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Author added Dahms |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Author added Rosen |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |