MN SF93 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Author stricken Schoen
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Author stricken Schoen
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Community medical response emergency medical technician services criteria modification
Title
Community medical response emergency medical technician services criteria modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | Author stricken Schoen |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF106 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF106 (Similar To) 2017-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 53 05/12/17