MN SF925 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative health care workforce commission expiration extension and work plan report requirement and appropriation
Title
Legislative health care workforce commission expiration extension and work plan report requirement and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Clausen [D] | Sen. Michelle Benson [R] | Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] | Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] |
Sen. Scott Jensen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1169 (Similar To) 2017-02-20 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy