MN SF915 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1186
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1186
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health services provisions modifications; mental health practitioner definition modification
Title
Mental health services provisions modifications; mental health practitioner definition modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1186 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1186 (Similar To) 2017-05-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 79