MN SF90 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Author stricken Dziedzic
Pending: Senate Family Care and Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Parental leave costs individual income and corporate franchise employer tax credits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parental leave costs individual income and corporate franchise employer tax credits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateAuthor stricken Dziedzic
2019-01-22SenateAuthor added Dziedzic
2019-01-17SenateAuthor added Rest
2019-01-14SenateAuthor added Ruud
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Family Care and Aging
2019-01-10SenateIntroduction and first reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback