MN SF877 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public utilities commission (PUC) railroads and utilities assessment imposition authority; railroad right-of-way crossing permission requirement and procedure establishment and appropriation
Title
Public utilities commission (PUC) railroads and utilities assessment imposition authority; railroad right-of-way crossing permission requirement and procedure establishment and appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-22 - House - House: Passage (Y: 125 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2016-05-31 | Secretary of State Chapter 180 | |
2016-05-31 | Governor's action Approval | |
2016-05-24 | Presented to Governor | |
2016-05-22 | Senate | Third reading vote: 65-0 |
2016-05-22 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2016-05-22 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2016-05-22 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 125-1 |
2016-05-22 | House | Third reading as amended |
2016-05-22 | House | Amended |
2016-05-20 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 22, 2016. |
2016-05-20 | House | Second reading |
2016-05-20 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2016-05-19 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF 963 |
2016-05-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 62-0 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Second reading |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Author added Westrom |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Environment and Energy |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Transportation and Public Safety |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF963 (Similar To) 2016-05-20 - Author added Johnson, C.