MN SF867 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Author added Murphy
Pending: Senate Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Morrison County C.A. Weyerhaeuser Museum bond issue and appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Morrison County C.A. Weyerhaeuser Museum bond issue and appropriation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-13SenateAuthor added Murphy
2023-02-01SenateAuthor added Jasinski
2023-01-27SenateReferred to Capital Investment
2023-01-27SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF616 (Similar To) 2023-01-19 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback