MN SF861 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Author added Little
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Author added Little
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Disabled veterans homestead credit maximum exclusion amount extension and increase
Title
Disabled veterans homestead credit maximum exclusion amount extension and increase
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Author added Little |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF910 (Similar To) 2017-02-23 - Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division