MN SF846 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Parenting with a disability support services pilot project establishment and appropriation
Title
Parenting with a disability support services pilot project establishment and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Jerry Relph [R] | Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF898 (Similar To) 2017-03-06 - Authors added Murphy, E., and Moran.