MN SF844 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 93
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 93
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus environment and natural resources appropriation bill
Title
Omnibus environment and natural resources appropriation bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-21 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 83 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 83 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 42 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 83 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 42 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Secretary of State Chapter 93 | |
2017-05-30 | Governor's action Approval | |
2017-05-26 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-05-21 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 83-51 |
2017-05-21 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2017-05-21 | House | Motion prevailed vote: 83-32 |
2017-05-21 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2017-05-21 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2017-05-21 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 42-25 |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Third reading vote: 42-25 |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2017-05-18 | Senate | House conferees Fabian; Uglem; Heintzeman; Swedzinski; Ecklund |
2017-05-17 | House | House conferees Fabian, Uglem, Heintzeman, Swedzinski, Ecklund |
2017-05-16 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed |
2017-05-16 | House | Senate conferees Ingebrigtsen, Ruud, Westrom, Mathews, Tomassoni |
2017-05-16 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate conferees Ingebrigtsen; Ruud; Westrom; Mathews; Tomassoni |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2017-05-04 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 130-0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Third reading as amended |
2017-05-04 | House | Amended |
2017-05-04 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 04, 2017 |
2017-04-27 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 1, 2017. |
2017-04-27 | House | Second reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2017-04-24 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF771 |
2017-04-24 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 65-0 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Special Order |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Chief author added Ingebrigtsen |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Johnson |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Author added Ingebrigtsen |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF771 (Similar To) 2017-04-27 - HF indefinitely postponed