MN SF842 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Senate: Author added Kubly
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Senate: Author added Kubly
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Automobile insurers repair facility ownership interest prohibition
Title
Automobile insurers repair facility ownership interest prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Senate: Author added Kubly | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Comm report: To pass | |
2009-04-01 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-04-01 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2009-02-19 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-02-19 | Senate: Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |