MN SF839 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pollution control agency whole effluent toxicity (WET) rules adoption statewide consistency requirement
Title
Pollution control agency whole effluent toxicity (WET) rules adoption statewide consistency requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1014 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Author added Kiel