MN SF839 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Chief author added Utke
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Chief author added Utke
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stays of adjudication in criminal sexual conduct cases are departures from the sentencing guidelines establishment; persons subject to stays of adjudication in criminal sexual conduct cases registration as predatory offenders requirement; criminal history points to be assessed against offenders who violate stays of adjudication in criminal sexual conduct cases for the stayed offense establishment
Title
Stays of adjudication in criminal sexual conduct cases are departures from the sentencing guidelines establishment; persons subject to stays of adjudication in criminal sexual conduct cases registration as predatory offenders requirement; criminal history points to be assessed against offenders who violate stays of adjudication in criminal sexual conduct cases for the stayed offense establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Mark Koran [R] | Sen. Rich Draheim [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Chief author added Utke |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Koran |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Author added Draheim |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF87 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Author added Runbeck