MN SF839 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 176
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 176
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Campaign finance and public disclosure rules codification; campaign finance and public disclosure board rulemaking authority modification; special election cycle end date change; contributions affidavits electronic submissions; obsolete rules repeal
Title
Campaign finance and public disclosure rules codification; campaign finance and public disclosure board rulemaking authority modification; special election cycle end date change; contributions affidavits electronic submissions; obsolete rules repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 176 | |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2419 (Similar To) 2017-03-23 - Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration