MN SF821 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Author added Wiger
Pending: Senate Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Author added Wiger
Pending: Senate Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
After-school community learning programs modifications; appropriation
Title
After-school community learning programs modifications; appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] | Sen. Roger Chamberlain [R] | Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] | Sen. Greg Clausen [D] |
Sen. Charles Wiger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | Senate | Author added Wiger |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Author added Clausen |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Education Finance and Policy |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF786 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Author added Jordan