MN SF803 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Veto message laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus judiciary and public safety appropriations bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus judiciary and public safety appropriations bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 75 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 73 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 34 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Passage (Y: 94 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 57 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 56 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 64 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 56 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16 Veto message laid on table
2017-05-16 Secretary of State Chapter 63
2017-05-15 Governor's action Veto
2017-05-15 Presented to Governor
2017-05-15HouseBill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 75-54
2017-05-15HouseThird reading as amended by Conference
2017-05-15HouseMotion prevailed vote: 73-55
2017-05-15HouseMotion to adopt conference committee report
2017-05-15HouseConference committee report, delete everything
2017-05-15HouseSenate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
2017-05-15SenateHouse adopted SCC report and repassed bill
2017-05-15SenateThird reading vote: 34-32
2017-05-15SenateSenate adopted CC report and repassed bill
2017-05-15SenateConference committee report, delete everything
2017-04-20SenateHouse conferees Cornish; Johnson, B.; Zerwas; Scott; Hilstrom
2017-04-18HouseHouse conferees Cornish; Johnson, B.; Zerwas; Scott; and Hilstrom.
2017-04-18HouseHouse accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed
2017-04-18HouseSenate conferees Limmer; Relph; Johnson; Anderson, B.; Latz
2017-04-18HouseSenate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2017-04-18SenateSenate conferees Limmer; Relph; Johnson; Anderson, B.; Latz
2017-04-03SenateSenate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2017-04-03SenateReturned from House with amendment
2017-04-03HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 94-37
2017-04-03HouseThird reading as amended
2017-04-03HouseAmended
2017-03-30HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 3, 2017
2017-03-30HouseSecond reading
2017-03-30HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2017-03-29HouseSenate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
2017-03-29HouseReceived from Senate
2017-03-28SenateThird reading Passed vote: 52-15
2017-03-28SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2017-03-27SenateSecond reading
2017-03-27SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2017-03-23SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2017-02-09SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF896 (Similar To) 2017-03-29 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF0803&ssn=0&y=2017
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF803&version=0&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF803&version=1&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF803&version=2&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF803&version=3&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF803&version=4&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=2181
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=SF0803&session_number=0&year=2017&id=136
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=SF0803&session_number=0&year=2017&id=137
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=SF0803&session_number=0&year=2017&id=138
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=SF0803&session_number=0&year=2017&id=140
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=SF0803&session_number=0&year=2017&id=141
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=SF0803&session_number=0&year=2017&id=142
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=SF0803&session_number=0&year=2017&id=143
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=4846
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=SF0803&session_number=0&year=2017&id=290
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=SF0803&session_number=0&year=2017&id=291

Bill Comments

feedback