MN SF800 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Veto message laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Veto message laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus health human services bill
Title
Omnibus health human services bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 76 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 76 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: Refuse to Adopt (Y: 55 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 34 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 74 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 52 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 76 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: Refuse to Adopt (Y: 55 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 34 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 74 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 52 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Veto message laid on table | |
2017-05-12 | Governor veto | |
2017-05-12 | Secretary of State Chapter 45 | |
2017-05-12 | Governor's action Veto | |
2017-05-09 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-05-09 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 76-56 |
2017-05-09 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2017-05-09 | House | House adopted conference committee report question recurred. |
2017-05-09 | House | Motion did not prevail vote: 55-75 |
2017-05-09 | House | Motion to return bill to conference committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2017-05-09 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2017-05-09 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 34-33 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third reading vote: 34-33 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2017-04-20 | Senate | House conferees Dean, M.; Schomacker; Albright; Kiel; Schultz |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate conferees Benson; Abeler; Housley; Utke; Lourey |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2017-04-18 | House | House conferees Dean, M.; Schomacker; Albright; Kiel; Schultz. |
2017-04-18 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed |
2017-04-18 | House | Senate conferees Benson; Abeler; Housley; Utke; Lourey |
2017-04-18 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-04-07 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 74-53 |
2017-04-07 | House | Third reading as amended |
2017-04-07 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2017-04-07 | House | Amended |
2017-04-05 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, April 7, 2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Second reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-04-04 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
2017-04-04 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 36-30 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF945 (Similar To) 2017-03-31 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means