MN SF8 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Assisted living licensing requirements, fees, and fines establishment; health and home care bills of rights modifications; home care licensing, office of health facility complaints powers, vulnerable adults act, and consumer protection modifications; task forces establishment; appropriations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assisted living licensing requirements, fees, and fines establishment; health and home care bills of rights modifications; home care licensing, office of health facility complaints powers, vulnerable adults act, and consumer protection modifications; task forces establishment; appropriations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2019-03-21SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2019-01-14SenateAuthors added Relph; Ruud; Abeler; Eken
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Family Care and Aging
2019-01-10SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF90 (Similar To) 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 60

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback