MN SF796 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 121
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 121
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus game and fish bill
Title
Omnibus game and fish bill
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Schmit [D] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Rep. David Dill [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-19 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Secretary of State Chapter 121 | |
2013-05-24 | Governor's action Approval | |
2013-05-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2013-05-19 | Senate | Third reading vote: 64-0 |
2013-05-19 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2013-05-19 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2013-05-19 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 123-0 |
2013-05-19 | House | Third reading as amended |
2013-05-19 | House | Amended |
2013-05-17 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 19, 2013 |
2013-05-17 | House | Second reading |
2013-05-17 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF742 |
2013-05-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 60-5 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Administration |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Energy |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |