MN SF786 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-13 - Author stricken Sheran
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-13 - Author stricken Sheran
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Silica sand mining provisions; southeastern Minnesota silica sand mining joint powers board authorization
Title
Silica sand mining provisions; southeastern Minnesota silica sand mining joint powers board authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Senate | Author stricken Sheran |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Energy |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |