MN SF78 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Off-sale alcoholic beverage sales exclusion when determining a food handler license fee authorization
Title
Off-sale alcoholic beverage sales exclusion when determining a food handler license fee authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF453 (Similar To) 2019-03-18 - Referred by Chair to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division