MN SF768 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF622
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Real estate brokers and licensees advertising requirements modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real estate brokers and licensees advertising requirements modifications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateRule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF622
2019-02-28SenateSecond reading
2019-02-28SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2019-02-27SenateAuthor added Housley
2019-02-07SenateAuthor added Sparks
2019-02-04SenateReferred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
2019-02-04SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF622 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 30 05/17/2019

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback